Richardson v. Mahon et al
Plaintiff: Curtis Richardson
Defendant: Matt Mahon, Karen Shepherd, Sgt Richardson, Major Johnson and South Carolina Department of Corrections Classification Supervisor (Name Unknown)
Case Number: 4:2015cv03317
Filed: August 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Horry
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The court agrees with the recommendations of the Magistrate Judge 96 and finds that the Magistrate Judge correctly applied the law to the facts of this case with the exception of th e excessive force claim. The court overrules Plaintiff's objections and GRANTS Defendants' (ECF No. 81 ) motion for summary judgment. Accordingly, Plaintiff's claims for excessive force, false arrest, and supervisory liability are DIS MISSED with prejudice. Plaintiff's claims related to the search of his house are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). Plaintiff's (ECF No. 88 )motion for preliminary injunction is DENIED. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 03/23/2017. (dsto, )
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 61 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 01/31/2017.(dsto, )
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court finds no clear error and therefore, adopts and incorporates by reference the R & R (ECF No. 64 ) of the Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, the Court DENIES Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunctive relief (ECF No. 28 ). Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 06/02/2016. (dsto, )
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER finding as moot 40 Motion for Extension of Time; denying 40 Motion to Compel; granting 45 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena as set forth; granting 55 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena as set forth; denying 22 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 22 Motion for Discovery; granting 25 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 27 Motion to Amend/Correct. An amended scheduling order is filed along with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 04/28/2016.(dsto, )
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The court hereby overrulesall of Plaintiff's objections and adopts and incorporates by reference the R&R 10 of the Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, Defendants Sgt Richardson, Maj or Johnson, and SCDC Classification Supervisor of Unknown Name are DISMISSED, without prejudice, and without issuance and service of process. Plaintiff's request in the objections to amend his complaint to add new claims and new parties is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 01/25/2016. (dsto, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Mahon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Mahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Corrections Classification Supervisor (Name Unknown)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?