Weaver v. Label Hospitality Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dan Weaver
Defendant: Label Hospitality Group LLC and Erez Sukarchi
Case Number: 4:2015cv03456
Filed: August 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Horry
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 RULE 16(a)(1) ORDER. Signed by the Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 2/3/2017. (hcic, )
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION UNDER THE FLSA. Signed by the Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 2/1/2017. (hcic, )
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO STAY ACTION. Signed by the Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 10/13/2015. (hcic, )
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by the Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 9/28/2015. (hcic, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weaver v. Label Hospitality Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Weaver
Represented By: Bruce E Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Label Hospitality Group LLC
Represented By: Benjamin A Baroody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erez Sukarchi
Represented By: Benjamin A Baroody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?