Tiedemann v. Southern Health Partners Inc et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Tiedemann
Defendant: Southern Health Partners Inc, Mellisa Van Dusor, Thomas Fox, Horry County and J Reuben Long Detention Center
Case Number: 4:2015cv05075
Filed: December 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Horry
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 JUDGMENT by the Clerk. This case is dismissed in its entirety. (dsto, )
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER denying 109 Motion for Discovery; denying 110 Motion to Continue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 02/14/2018.(dsto, )
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time (Document # 82 ) is GRANTED with respect to the request for an extension of time to amend his complaint and his Motion to Amend (Document # 81 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Cou rt is directed to file Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, which is included as an attachment to his motion. As a result of the filing of the Amended Complaint, Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment (Documents # 50 , 73 ) are moot.IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 07/25/2017.(dsto, )
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 18 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 30 Motion to Amend/Correct; 39 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 46 Motion to Compel; denying 47 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; denying [57 ] Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 66 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff must file one, complete amended complaint in accordance with his motions as well as the requisite service documents within ten days of the date of this order. If Plaintiff fails to do so, the original complaint will remain in place. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 02/02/2017.(dsto, )
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court ADOPTS the R. & R. (Dkt. No. 13 ) as the Order of the Court. The Court DISMISSES the J. Reuben Long Detention Center from this action without prejudice and without service of process. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 03/30/2016. (dsto, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tiedemann v. Southern Health Partners Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Tiedemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Health Partners Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mellisa Van Dusor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horry County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Reuben Long Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?