Pressley v. Hopehealth Inc et al
Plaintiff: Monique S Pressley
Defendant: Hopehealth Inc and Steve L Reeves
Case Number: 4:2016cv00086
Filed: January 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Williamsburg
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER APPROVING WRONGFUL DEATH SETTLEMENT. Signed by the Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 8/29/2017. (hcic, )
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 10 Motion to Substitute Party. United States of America added, Hopehealth Inc and Steve L Reeves (MD) terminated. Signed by the Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 4/11/2016. (hcic, )
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting protection from court appearance for Attorney Robert D.Dodson from May 19, 2016 through May 31, 2016. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 1/22/2016. (gnan )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pressley v. Hopehealth Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique S Pressley
Represented By: Robert Daniel Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopehealth Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve L Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?