Jarmuth v. South Carolina, State of et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Jarmuth
Defendant: South Carolina, State of and Horry County Court of Common Pleas
Case Number: 4:2016cv00242
Filed: January 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Horry
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER denying 78 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by the Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 03/12/2018. (lsut, )
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER RULING ON 68 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Defendant's [ECF No. 45 ] motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim is GRANTED. This case is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiff's [ECF No. 50 ] motion to disqualify McNair Law Firm and Plaintiff's [ECF No. 53 ] motion to compel HOA Attorney to use U.S. Post Office Counter Service to Serve Pleadings are DENIED as MOOT. Signed by the Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 3/27/2016. (hcic, )
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER. It is not entirely clear from the record presented whether the retaliation claim raised here was "available" to Plaintiff in the previous state actions. Therefore, within ten days of the date of this order, the parties are directed to provide additional argument and court records, if applicable, addressing this issue. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 01/10/2017. (dsto, )
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RULING ON 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court has thoroughly reviewed the entire record, including the R & R 14 and objections, andapplicable law. The Plaintiff's 14 motion to amend is granted as set fort h herein, and Defendants State of South Carolina and Horry County Court of Common Pleas are dismissed. The International Club Homeowners Association, Inc. is added as a defendant. Plaintiff's 7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is denied as moot. The case is recommitted to the Magistrate Judge for furtherhandling. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 06/08/2016. (dsto, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jarmuth v. South Carolina, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Jarmuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horry County Court of Common Pleas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?