Baker v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: John Bolton Baker
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2016cv01262
Filed: April 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 29 Motion for Attorney Fees per Rule 406b in the amount of $36,908.75. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 12/19/2018.(gnan )
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 25 Motion for Attorney Fees under EAJA in the amount of $4,213.94 ($4,197.94 + 16.00) to be paid in accordance with the Commissioner's procedures set forth in her response. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 4/4/2017.(gnan )
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 JUDGMENT: The Commissioner's decision is reversed and the case is remanded pursuant to sentence four of § 405(g) for further administrative proceedings. (gnan )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bolton Baker
Represented By: W Daniel Mayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?