Centeno v. Meeks et al

Plaintiff: Alexis Centeno
Defendant: J Meeks, Simmons, Ray Burn, Mrs Urrea, Whitehurst, Luranth and Dr Massa
Case Number: 4:2016cv01482
Filed: May 6, 2016
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Florence Office
County: Williamsburg
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, Federal Filers (Bivens)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2017 83 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by the Clerk. This case is dismissed with prejudice for failure to prosecute, in accordance with Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (dsto, )
September 18, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 72 Motion to Substitute Party. United States of America added. Dr Massa (Medical Doctor), J Meeks (Warden), Simmons (Assistance Warden), Mrs Urrea (HSA), Whitehurst (AHSA), Ray Burn (Capetian) and Luranth (Medical Director) terminated Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 09/18/2017.(dsto, )
June 28, 2017 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court adopts and incorporates the Magistrate Judges Report (ECF No. 58 ), and the Court grants Defendants' motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 26 ) with respect to Plaintiff 's Bivens claim. The Court also grants Defendants 45 days to supplement with Certification and file dispositive motions with regard to any FTCA claim. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 06/28/2017. (dsto, )
March 7, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The parties have ten days to submit a supplemental brief on the validity as to any claim Plaintiff is asserting under the FTCA to include, but not limited to, the provision discussed above including whether or not Plaintiff complied with the requirements for administrative exhaustion of a FTCA action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 03/07/2017. (dsto, )
January 18, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The motion to dismiss 26 is being converted to a motion for summary judgment. Defendants have an additional five days from the date of this order to make any additional submissions in accordance with Rule 56 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 1/18/2017. (dsto, )
December 9, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by the Clerk. This action is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 41(b). (dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Centeno v. Meeks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Centeno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Burn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs Urrea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitehurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luranth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Massa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?