Ward v. Blackwell et al
Plaintiff: Matthew J. Ward
Defendant: James Blackwell, Tamara Ravenell and Jack Kicinski
Case Number: 4:2017cv00367
Filed: February 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Referring Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER denying 107 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 7/12/2018.(abuc)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court adopts and incorporates the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge 87 . Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 58 is GRANTED with respect to Plaintiff� 39;s claims against Defendants in their official capacities and with respect to Plaintiff's claims against Blackwell and Ravenell. Defendants' Motion is DENIED as to Plaintiff's claim against Kicinski in his individual capacity.IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 05/16/2018. (dsto, )
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court respectfully declines to adopt the Report 75 and recommits this matter to the Magistrate Judge for consideration of the Motion for Summary Judgment and the Response in Opposition. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr. on 01/30/2018. (dsto, )
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time (Document # 49 )is GRANTED and Motion to Compel (Document # 53 ) is DENIED as set forth above. Plaintiff must file a response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Document # 58 ) within ten days of the date of this order. Failure to file a response may result in a recommendation that Plaintiff's case be dismissed for failure to prosecute. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 12/21/2017.(dsto, )
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER: Plaintiff has seven days from the date of this Order to submit to the court any evidence indicating that he served the discovery requests at issue on Defendant Blackwell and/or Defendant Ravenell. Response due December 19, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 12/11/2017. (dsto, )
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The court declines to adopt the magistrate judge's Report and Recommendation 18 . It is therefore ORDERED that Ward file an amended complaint within 15 days of this order. It is further ORDERED that this case is remanded to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr. on 04/03/2017. (dsto, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Blackwell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew J. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamara Ravenell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Kicinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?