Bixby v. Stirling et al

Petitioner: Steven Vernon Bixby
Respondent: Bryan Stirling and Joseph McFadden
Case Number: 4:2017cv00954
Filed: April 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondents shall answer or otherwise respond to the Petition by 60 days from April 16, 2018. Petitioner shall respond to Respondents answer thirty-five days after such answer is filed. Respondents shall have fourteen days after Petitioner's response is filed to reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 04/11/2018. (dsto, )
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER: Within five days of the date of this order, Respondents are instructed to inform the court if they disagree with the assertion by Petitioner that the one year statute of limitations under the AEDPA does not expire until after March 23, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 12/14/2017. (dsto, )
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: The Court hereby denies the pro se motion (ECF No. 38 ) and denies the request to substitute counsel, to the extent Petitioners pro se brief can be read to make such a request (ECF No. 39 ). The Court further declines to consider any other claims raised in Petitioner's pro se habeas corpus brief (ECF No. 39 ). Petitioner should seek relief from this Court through his appointed counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 08/03/2017.(dsto, )
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 1 Motion to Stay. The stay shall expire ninety (90) days from the date counsel is appointed; (2) The Clerk of Court shall assign a civil action number to this case; (3) The Clerk of Court shall notify the und ersigned to review the stay of execution twenty (20) days prior to the expiration of the ninety (90) day limit; and (4) This matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge for all preliminary proceedings. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 04/12/2017.(dsto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bixby v. Stirling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Vernon Bixby
Represented By: Daniel J Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bryan Stirling
Represented By: Melody Jane Brown
Represented By: Donald John Zelenka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joseph McFadden
Represented By: Melody Jane Brown
Represented By: Donald John Zelenka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?