Geissler v. Sterling et al
Plaintiff: Russell Geissler
Defendant: Bryan P Sterling and Lefford Fate
Case Number: 4:2017cv01746
Filed: June 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Florence Office
County: Richland
Presiding Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 OPINION AND ORDER granting 149 Motion for Partial Settlement; granting 166 Motion to Substitute Documents Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 8/5/2019.(mdea )
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 CONSENT CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 08/21/2018. (dsto, )
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 14 Motion To Adjust Titles of Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 10/06/2017.(dsto, )
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying 15 Motion to Request Document Production; denying 16 Second Motion to Request Document Production. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 09/01/2017.(dsto, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geissler v. Sterling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Geissler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan P Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lefford Fate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?