Barrette Outdoor Living, Inc. v. Action Fence Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Barrette Outdoor Living, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1-10, Action Fence Company, LLC, Uffda Creative, LLC and Does 2-10
Case Number: 4:2018cv02545
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 19 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 17. Reason: Attachments within main document. Corrected Filing Document Number #18 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: N/A - Correction made on same date as original filing. Response due date modified to that of original filing: N/A. (cbru, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 18 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Barrette Outdoor Living, Inc. Action Fence Company, LLC served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Acceptance of Service)(Pittman, Jason) Modified to edit text on 11/9/2018 (cbru, ).
October 18, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barrette Outdoor Living, Inc. Uffda Creative, LLC served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. (Pittman, Jason) (Main Document 15 replaced on 11/8/2018) (cbru, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2018: #1 Proof of Service) (cbru, ). Modified to edit text and to separate attachment from main document on 11/8/2018 (cbru, ).
October 16, 2018 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Action Fence Company, LLC. (cbru, )
October 15, 2018 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Uffda Creative, LLC. (cbru, )
October 15, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Action Fence Company, LLC, Uffda Creative, LLC, Does 2-10 filed by Barrette Outdoor Living, Inc.. Service due by 1/14/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Swing, #2 Exhibit 2 - Juniper Haven, #3 Exhibit 3 - Dogwood Haven, #4 Exhibit 4 - White Fence, #5 Exhibit 5 - Circular Pool, #6 Exhibit 6 - Gold Fin Aluminum, #7 Exhibit 7 - Haven Arrowwood, #8 Exhibit 8 - Backyard Pool Banner, #9 Exhibit 9 - Backyard Pool Panoramic, #10 Exhibit 10 - Soccer Panoramic, #11 Exhibit 11 - Backyard Panoramic, #12 Exhibit 12 - Swing Derivative, #13 Exhibit 13 - Juniper Haven Derivative, #14 Exhibit 14 - Dogwood Haven Derivative, #15 Exhibit 15 - White Fence Derivative, #16 Exhibit 16 - Gold Fin Derivative, #17 Exhibit 17 - Haven Arrowwood Derivative, #18 Exhibit 18 - Backyard Pool Banner Derivative, #19 Exhibit 19 - Soccer Panoramic Derivative, #20 20 - Exhibit Homepage Derivative, #21 Exhibit 21 - Three Step Derivative, #22 Summons Uffda Creative LLC) (Pittman, Jason) Modified to edit text on 10/15/2018 (cbru, ). (Main Document 11 replaced on 10/15/2018) (cbru, ).
September 19, 2018 Filing 10 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 7,8. Reason: Per request of e-filing attorney. Corrected Filing Document Number #9 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: N/A - Correction made on same date as original filing. Response due date modified to that of original filing: N/A. (cbru, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. First attachment description: Exhibit 1 - Swing Photograph and Copyright Registration . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Juniper Haven Photograph, #2 Exhibit 3 - Dogwood Haven Photograph, #3 Exhibit 4 - White Fence Photograph, #4 Exhibit 5 - Circular Pool Photograph, #5 Exhibit 6 - Gold Fin Aluminum Photograph, #6 Exhibit 7 - Haven Arrowwood Photograph, #7 Exhibit 8 - Backyard Pool Banner, #8 Exhibit 9 - Backyard Pool Panoramic Photograph, #9 Exhibit 10 - Soccer Panoramic Photograph, #10 Exhibit 11 - Backyard Panoramic Photograph, #11 Exhibit 12 - Swing Derivative Photograph, #12 Exhibit 13 - Juniper Haven Derivative Photograph, #13 Exhibit 14 - Dogwood Haven Derivative Photograph, #14 Exhibit 15 - White Fence Derivative Photograph, #15 Exhibit 16 - Gold Fin Derivative Photograph, #16 Exhibit 17 - Haven Arrowwood Derivative, #17 Exhibit 18 - Backyard Pool Banner Derivative, #18 Exhibit 19 - Soccer Panoramic Derivative, #19 Exhibit 20 - Homepage Derivative Photograph, #20 Exhibit 21 - Three Step Derivative Photograph)(Pittman, Jason)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #5 Report on the Filing or Determination of Copyright placed in U.S. Mail to Register of Copyrights (cbru, )
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (cbru, )
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Action Fence Company, LLC. (cbru, )
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Barrette Outdoor Living, Inc.(cbru, )
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Action Fence Company, LLC, Does 1-10 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8000706) filed by Barrette Outdoor Living, Inc. Service due by 12/17/2018(cbru, ) Additional attachments filed as entry #9 on 9/18/2018 (cbru, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrette Outdoor Living, Inc. v. Action Fence Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barrette Outdoor Living, Inc.
Represented By: Tim F Williams
Represented By: Jason Alan Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Action Fence Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uffda Creative, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 2-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?