Schade v. Speedway LLC
Plaintiff: Traci Schade
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv02897
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Consent Motion to Remand to State Court. This case is hereby REMANDED to the Horry County Court of Common Pleas. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 12/18/2018.(tmcb, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Traci Schade. Response to Motion due by 12/27/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(McPherson, Jarrod)
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 11/20/2018, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 12/4/2018, Rule 26 Report due by 12/4/2018, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/29/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/28/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/1/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/1/2019, Discovery due by 5/29/2019, Motions due by 6/13/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 8/27/2019, ADR Statement due by 7/12/2019, Mediation Due by 8/12/2019. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to date set for jury selection. Responses to motions in limine shall be filed within seven (7) days after the motion is filed. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after 10/07/2019. Signed by the Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 10/31/2018. (lsut, )
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Speedway LLC. (Crites, J). Modified on 10/29/2018 to correct event type. (prou, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Speedway LLC. (lsut, ). Modified on 10/31/2018 to correct main document (lsut, ).
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Horry County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-CP-26-04984 (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8074241), filed by Speedway LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Delaware Corp. Bureau Confirmation) (lsut, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schade v. Speedway LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traci Schade
Represented By: Jarrod McKinley McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: J Bennett Crites, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?