Griffin et al v. King Cunningham LLC

Plaintiff: W Britt Griffin, III and Susan Griffin
Defendant: King Cunningham LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv02933
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by the Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 12/19/2018. (lsut, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by King Cunningham LLC. Response to Motion due by 12/28/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(MacKelcan, Douglas)
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by W Britt Griffin, III, Susan Griffin. King Cunningham LLC served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (Attachment: #1 King Cunningham Return of Service) (Tallini, Richard) Modified on 12/14/2018 to replace incorrect document with correct document as provided by filing user (lsut, ).
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by the Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 11/9/2018. (lsut, )
November 7, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian P. Parker ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8095498) by Susan Griffin, W Britt Griffin, III. Response to Motion due by 11/21/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Motion in Support of Pro Hac Vice Application) Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Tallini, Richard) Modified on 11/9/2018 to remove proposed order (lsut, ).
October 30, 2018 Filing 5 Plaintiffs Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Susan Griffin, W Britt Griffin, III.(Tallini, Richard)
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to King Cunningham LLC. Service due by 1/28/2019. (lsut, )
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against King Cunningham LLC (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8078750), filed by W Britt Griffin, III, Susan Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Purchase Agreement) (lsut, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin et al v. King Cunningham LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King Cunningham LLC
Represented By: Douglas Walker MacKelcan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W Britt Griffin, III
Represented By: Richard Fiory Tallini
Represented By: Brian P Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Griffin
Represented By: Richard Fiory Tallini
Represented By: Brian P Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?