Burns v. Trans Union LLC et al

Plaintiff: Latisha Burns
Defendant: Santander Consumer USA Inc, Warehouse Home Furnishings Distributors Inc, Trans Union LLC and Equifax Information Services LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv03120
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 19 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 2/4/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/19/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 2/19/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/15/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/15/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/14/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/14/2019, Discovery due by 8/13/2019, Motions due by 8/28/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 11/12/2019, ADR Statement due by 9/28/2019, Mediation Due by 10/28/2019. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to date set for jury selection. Responses to motions in limine shall be filed within seven (7) days after the motion is filed. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after 01/06/2020. Signed by the Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 1/15/2019. (lsut, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(Johnson, Wilbur)
January 3, 2019 Filing 16 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Santander Consumer USA Inc answer due 1/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Email)(Rummage, Ryan)
January 2, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC. Service due by 4/2/2019. (lsut, ) Modified on 01/02/2019 to correct event type. (lsut)
December 28, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Latisha Burns re #1 Complaint re TransUnion (Kozloski, Aaron) (Attachment: #1 Proof of Service Trans Union LLC) (Main Document 14 replaced on 1/4/2019 to replace incorrect document with correct document as provided by filing user) (lsut, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Latisha Burns re #1 Complaint re Santander (Kozloski, Aaron) (Attachment: #1 Proof of Service Santander Consumer USA Inc) Main Document 13 replaced on 1/4/2019 to replace incorrect document with correct document as provided by filing user) (lsut, ).
December 28, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Latisha Burns re #1 Complaint re Farmer's Furniture (Kozloski, Aaron) (Attachment: #1 Proof of Service Warehouse Home Furnishings Distributors Inc f/k/a Farmers Furniture Company) (Main Document 12 replaced on 1/4/2019 to replace incorrect document with correct document as provided by filing user) (lsut, ).
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #9 Motion for Extension of Time: In light of Plaintiff's #10 amended complaint, Defendant Santander Consumer USA, Inc.'s instant #9 motion is moot. Signed by the Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 12/21/2018.(eney, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Latisha Burns. Service due by 3/21/2019 (Kozloski, Aaron)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Santander Consumer USA Inc. Response to Motion due by 1/3/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Ryan S. Rummage)No proposed order.(Rummage, Ryan)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Defendant Trans Union LLC. Answer from Trans Union LLC now due January 14, 2019. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 12/19/2018.(tmcb, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Trans Union LLC.(Johnson, Wilbur)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Trans Union LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Johnson, Wilbur)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Santander Consumer USA Inc, Trans Union LLC, Warehouse Home Furnishings Distributors Inc. Service due by 2/19/2019. (lsut, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Latisha Burns. (lsut, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Santander Consumer USA Inc, Trans Union LLC, Warehouse Home Furnishings Distributors Inc (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8115337), filed by Latisha Burns. (lsut, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. Trans Union LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Consumer USA Inc
Represented By: Ryan Sikes Rummage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warehouse Home Furnishings Distributors Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Wilbur Eugene Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latisha Burns
Represented By: Aaron J Kozloski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?