Long v. Galmore et al
Plaintiff: William Von Long
Defendant: Keven Bradly Soggs and James C. Galmore
Case Number: 4:2019cv00053
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Referring Judge: R Bryan Harwell
2 Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 21 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: 20 Case Reassigned placed in U.S. Mail to William Von Long, #238950, PCI, 430 Oaklawn Road, Pelzer, SC, 29669 (dsto, )
March 7, 2019 Filing 20 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr. Judge Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 18 OBJECTION to #16 Report and Recommendation by William Von Long. Reply to Objections due by 3/5/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dsto, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 17 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION w/NEF, #15 Order - 1983 - No Service w/NEF placed in U.S. Mail to William Von Long, #238950, PCI, 430 Oaklawn Road, Pelzer, SC, 29669 (dsto, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the district court summarily dismiss the complaint in this case without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 2/20/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 02/06/2019. (dsto, )
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 02/06/2019. (dsto, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Keven Bradly Soggs, filed by William Von Long. Service due by 4/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dsto, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENTS RE-MAILED: #6 Proper Form Order w/NEF, Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, (2)Summons, (2)USM-285s, 7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail to William Von Long, #238950, PCI, 430 Oaklawn Road, Pelzer, SC, 29669 (dsto, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #6 Proper Form Order w/NEF, Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, (2)Summons, (2)USM-285s, 7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail to William Von Long, #238950, BRCI, 4460 BRR, Columbia, SC, 29201 (dsto, )
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis re: #6 Proper Form Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 01/09/2019.(dsto)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 1/30/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 01/09/2019. (dsto, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Florence. (dsto, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by William Von Long. Response to Motion due by 1/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate, #2 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(dsto, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James C. Galmore, Keven Bradly Soggs, filed by William Von Long. Service due by 4/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Warrant, #2 Envelope)(dsto, ) (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/14/2019) (dsto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. Galmore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keven Bradly Soggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C. Galmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Von Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?