Bolden v. Select Portfolio Servicing Inc

Plaintiff: Laurie V Bolden
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00524
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Referring Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE for 4/23/2019 10:00 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 3/19/2019. (abuc)
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/8/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/3/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/27/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/29/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/16/2019, Discovery due by 9/16/2019, Motion in Limine due by 11/14/2019, Motions due by 9/30/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 11/25/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 12/16/2019, Mediation Due by 10/15/2019, Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 3/19/2019. (abuc)
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc.(Barnwell, Brian)
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc.(Barnwell, Brian)
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr. Judge Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laurie V Bolden. Select Portfolio Servicing Inc served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.)(Maxfield, David)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Select Portfolio Servicing Inc. Service due by 5/23/2019. (gnan )
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Laurie V Bolden.(gnan )
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Select Portfolio Servicing Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8283389), filed by Laurie V Bolden. Service due by 5/22/2019. (Exhibit #1 Email to SPS 3-28-17, Exhibit #2 Schedule-Creditors, Exhibit #3 Statement of Intention, Exhibit #4 Discharge Order, Exhibit #5 SPS Escrow Disclosure 8-18-17, Exhibit #6 SPS Mtg Statement 7-24-17, Exhibit #7 SPS Mtg Statement 8-24-18, Exhibit #8 SPS Mtg Statement 9-24-18, Exhibit #9 SPS Mtg Statement 10-24-18, Exhibit #10 SPS Mtg Statement 11-23-18, Exhibit #11 Mtg Statement 12-24-18, Exhibit#12 Delinquent Tax Notice 12-3-18, Exhibit #13 SPS Experian Pull 11-6-18).(gnan )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bolden v. Select Portfolio Servicing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie V Bolden
Represented By: David Andrew Maxfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc
Represented By: Matthew D Patterson
Represented By: Brian Montgomery Barnwell
Represented By: James H Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?