Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company v. Carlino
Plaintiff: Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company
Defendant: Timothy Carlino
Case Number: 4:2019cv01413
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Harry Cooper Wilson, III on behalf of Timothy Carlino (Wilson, Harry) (Main Document 6 replaced on 7/12/2019 to replace incorrect document with correct document as provided by filing user) (lsut, ).
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline LaPan Edgerton on behalf of Timothy Carlino (Edgerton, Jacqueline)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Timothy Carlino. Service due by 8/13/2019. (lsut, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company. (lsut, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Timothy Carlino (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8444027), filed by Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter of Certification, #2 Exhibit B - Underlying Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Answer in Underlying Case) (lsut, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company v. Carlino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company
Represented By: John Robert Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Carlino
Represented By: Jacqueline LaPan Edgerton
Represented By: Harry Cooper Wilson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?