Broadcast Music Inc et al v. Cottage Street Crew LLC et al
Plaintiff: Universal Songs of Polygram International Inc, Concord Music Group Inc, Jayboy Music Corp, Fuel Publishing Inc, Cyanide Publishing, Broadcast Music Inc and BMG Rights Management (US) LLC
Defendant: Christopher Scrudato and Cottage Street Crew LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv01422
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cyanide Publishing, Concord Music Group Inc, Fuel Publishing Inc, BMG Rights Management (US) LLC, Jayboy Music Corp, Broadcast Music Inc, Universal Songs of Polygram International Inc. Cottage Street Crew LLC served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Ellis, Bernie)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cyanide Publishing, Concord Music Group Inc, Fuel Publishing Inc, Jayboy Music Corp, Broadcast Music Inc, Universal Songs of Polygram International Inc. Christopher Scrudato served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Ellis, Bernie)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/1/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/15/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 7/15/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/9/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/8/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/7/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/7/2019, Discovery due by 1/6/2020, Motions due by 1/21/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 4/6/2020, ADR Statement due by 2/23/2020, Mediation Due by 3/23/2020. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to date set for trial. Responses to motions in limine shall be filed within seven (7) days after the motion is filed. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after 06/01/2020. Signed by Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell on 06/10/2019. (lsut, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Cottage Street Crew LLC.(Scott, Cheveron)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Christopher Scrudato.(Scott, Cheveron)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED: #1 Complaint and #5 Report on the Filing or Determination of Copyright to 508filings@loc.gov. Confirmation attached. (lsut, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (lsut, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cottage Street Crew LLC, Christopher Scrudato. Service due by 8/14/2019. (lsut, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by BMG Rights Management (US) LLC, Broadcast Music Inc, Concord Music Group Inc, Cyanide Publishing, Fuel Publishing Inc, Jayboy Music Corp, Universal Songs of Polygram International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schedule 7.1)(lsut, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cottage Street Crew LLC, Christopher Scrudato (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8446306), filed by Cyanide Publishing, Concord Music Group Inc, Fuel Publishing Inc, BMG Rights Management (US) LLC, Jayboy Music Corp, Broadcast Music Inc, Universal Songs of Polygram International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Songs) (lsut, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music Inc et al v. Cottage Street Crew LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Songs of Polygram International Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concord Music Group Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayboy Music Corp
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fuel Publishing Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyanide Publishing
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music Inc
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMG Rights Management (US) LLC
Represented By: Bernie W Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Scrudato
Represented By: Cheveron T Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cottage Street Crew LLC
Represented By: Cheveron T Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?