Rock v. Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Linda Rock
Defendant: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Michael Klug, Brentwood Services Inc and Brentwood Services Administrators, Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv01433
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Brentwood Services Administrators, Inc, Michael Klug.(Chase, Gerald) Modified on 6/28/2019 to replace main document with correct document as requested by filing user (mcot, ).
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email confirmation of extension)(Chase, Gerald)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Linda Rock.(Taylor, Ian)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Horry County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Filed State Court Acknowledgment)(Chase, Gerald)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE for 7/18/2019 02:30 PM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Defendants counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by the Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 06/19/2019. (lsut, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/9/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/3/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/27/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/28/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/18/2019, Discovery due by 12/16/2019, Motion in Limine due by 2/14/2020, Motions due by 12/30/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 2/24/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 3/16/2020, Mediation Due by 1/13/2020. Signed by the Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 06/19/2019. (lsut, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Linda Rock. Service due by 9/5/2019 (Taylor, Ian)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Brentwood Services Inc, Michael Klug.(Chase, Gerald)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Michael Klug. (lsut, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Brentwood Services Inc. (lsut, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company. (lsut, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Horry County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-26-02225 (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8449283), filed by Brentwood Services Inc, Michael Klug, Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - SC Dept. of Ins. Letter) (lsut, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rock v. Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Gerald Thomas Chase
Represented By: Robert Charles Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Klug
Represented By: Gerald Thomas Chase
Represented By: Robert Charles Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brentwood Services Inc
Represented By: Gerald Thomas Chase
Represented By: Robert Charles Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brentwood Services Administrators, Inc
Represented By: Gerald Thomas Chase
Represented By: Robert Charles Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Rock
Represented By: Ian A Taylor
Represented By: Jeffrey D Morris
Represented By: Joseph Clay Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?