Carroway v. Government Employees Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Shawayne Carroway
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv01481
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 22 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Shawayne Carroway.(Johnson, Brown) Modified to edit text on 6/27/2019 (cbru, ).
June 26, 2019 Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Response to Motion due by 8/8/2019) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 6/26/2019.(cbru, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION byShawayne Carroway re #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Johnson, Brown)
June 26, 2019 Filing 19 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Shawayne Carroway.(Johnson, Brown) Modified to edit text on 6/26/2019 (cbru, ).
June 26, 2019 Filing 18 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Government Employees Insurance Company.(Robinson, Jonathan)
June 25, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Shawayne Carroway. Response to Motion due by 7/9/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Johnson, Brown) Modified to correct motion relief on 6/25/2019 (cbru, ). (Main Document 17 replaced on 6/26/2019) (cbru, ).
June 25, 2019 Filing 16 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Government Employees Insurance Company.(Robinson, Jonathan)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: On June 6, 2019, the Clerk reminded Plaintiff that "Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed no later than 14 days after service of the notice of removal". The Clerk requested that he "file these answers to interrogatories no later than June 20, 2019". Nevertheless, the deadline has passed and he has failed to do so. Therefore, not later than the close of business on June 24, 2019, the Court directs Plaintiff to file his answers. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Answer to LR26.01 Interrogatories due by 6/24/2019) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 6/21/2019. (cbru, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Government Employees Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 6/24/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Insurance Policy)No proposed order.(Smith, G) Modified to add description to attachment on 6/11/2019 (cbru, ).
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M Robinson on behalf of Government Employees Insurance Company (Robinson, Jonathan)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff is reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed no later than 14 days after service of the notice of removal. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than June 20, 2019. (cbru, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 6/4/2019.(cbru, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Edward H. Wasmuth, Jr. (Filing fee $250 receipt number 0420-8481954) by Government Employees Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 6/17/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application/Affidavit and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Smith, G) Modified to edit text on 6/4/2019 (cbru, ).
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 5/22/2019. (cbru, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 6/25/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/22/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/19/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/18/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/18/2019, Discovery due by 11/18/2019, Motion in Limine due by 3/2/2020, Motions due by 12/2/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 2/18/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 3/23/2020, Mediation Due by 1/31/2020. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 5/22/2019. (cbru, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Shawayne Carroway by Government Employees Insurance Company.(cbru, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Government Employees Insurance Company.(cbru, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Florence County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-21-01114 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8457880) filed by Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(cbru, ) Modified to correct filing date on 5/22/2019 (cbru, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carroway v. Government Employees Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: G Murrell Smith, Jr
Represented By: Shanon Nicole Peake
Represented By: Jonathan M Robinson
Represented By: Edward Henry Wasmuth, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawayne Carroway
Represented By: Brown William Johnson
Represented By: Nathaniel Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?