Owners Insurance Company v. Ocean View Towers Association Inc et al
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: Tradd Management LLC and Ocean View Towers Association Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv01564
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support by Owners Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 8/6/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Policy of Insurance, #2 Exhibit B-Policy of Insurance, #3 Exhibit C-Policy of Insurance, #4 Exhibit D-Policy of Insurance, #5 Exhibit E-Complaint, #6 Exhibit F-ROR letters, #7 Exhibit G-Endorsement 55238, #8 Exhibit H-Definitions Page)No proposed order.(Templeton, Morgan)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay Discovery & Entry of Scheduling Order by Owners Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 8/6/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Templeton, Morgan)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tradd Management LLC.(Wylie, Robert)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ocean View Towers Association Inc.(Wylie, Robert)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Tradd Management LLC.(Wylie, Robert)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Ocean View Towers Association Inc.(Wylie, Robert)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Owners Insurance Company. Ocean View Towers Association Inc served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service by Certified Mail, #2 Exhibit A-Green card)(Templeton, Morgan)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Owners Insurance Company. Tradd Management LLC served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service by Certified Mail, #2 Exhibit A-Gteen Card)(Templeton, Morgan)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ocean View Towers Association Inc, Tradd Management LLC. Service due by 8/29/2019. (lsut, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Owners Insurance Company. (lsut, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ocean View Towers Association Inc, Tradd Management LLC (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8473348), filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Policy of Insurance-Part 1, #2 Exhibit A-Policy of Insurance-Part 2, #3 Exhibit A-Policy of Insurance-Part 3, #4 Exhibit A-Policy of Insurance-Part 4, #5 Exhibit B-Underlying Action, #6 Exhibit B-Underlying Action-Part 2, #7 Exhibit B-Underlying Action-Part 3, #8 Exhibit B-Underlying Action-Part 4, #9 Exhibit B-Underlying Action-Part 5) (lsut, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owners Insurance Company v. Ocean View Towers Association Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tradd Management LLC
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean View Towers Association Inc
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Morgan S Templeton
Represented By: Stephanie Paige Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?