Cloer et al v. CSX Transportation Inc et al
Plaintiff: Susan Cloer, Alexander Sweatt and Glenda Sweatt
Defendant: Bobby Odom, Town of McColl and CSX Transportation Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv01599
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 21 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 17 Reason: The wrong event was used. Corrected by Clerk. Corrected Filing Document Number #20 . (lsut, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Set Aside Default by Bobby Odom, Town of McColl. Response to Motion due by 8/6/2019. No proposed order. (Ohanesian, Gregory) Modified on 7/24/2019 to correct event type (lsut, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bobby Odom.(Ohanesian, Gregory)
July 23, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bobby Odom, Town of McColl.(Ohanesian, Gregory)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/12/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/26/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 8/26/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/21/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/19/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/19/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/19/2019, Discovery due by 2/17/2020, Motions due by 3/3/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/18/2020, ADR Statement due by 4/4/2020, Mediation Due by 5/4/2020. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to date set for jury selection. Responses to motions in limine shall be filed within seven (7) days after the motion is filed. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after 07/06/2020. Signed by Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell on 07/22/2019. (lsut, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Town of McColl and Bobby Odom by Susan Cloer, Alexander Sweatt, Glenda Sweatt. Response to Motion due by 8/5/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, #3 Certificate of Service)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Poston, Eric) Modified on 7/22/2019 to remove proposed order (lsut, ).
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by CSX Transportation Inc.(Wray, Ronald)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CSX Transportation Inc. Response to Motion due by 8/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Wray, Ronald)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CSX Transportation Inc.(Wray, Ronald)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Bobby Odom, Town of McColl. (lsut, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT bySusan Cloer, Alexander Sweatt, Glenda Sweatt. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Entry of Default, #3 Certificate of Service)(Poston, Eric) Modified on 7/19/2019 to remove proposed order (lsut, ).
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Susan Cloer, Alexander Sweatt, Glenda Sweatt. (Attachment(s): #1 Affidavit of Service - Bobby Odom, #2 Affidavit of Service - Town of McColl) (Poston, Eric) Modified on 7/9/2019 to correct event type (lsut, ) Modified on 7/24/2019 to replace attachments with corrected document provided by filing user (lsut, ). (Entered: 07/09/2019)
July 7, 2019 Filing 6 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Susan Cloer, Alexander Sweatt, Glenda Sweatt. All Defendants. (Poston, Eric)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER CSX Transportation Inc answer due 7/22/2019. (Wray, Ronald)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CSX Transportation Inc, Bobby Odom, Town of McColl. Service due by 9/3/2019. (lsut, ) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/5/2019 to correct case number) (lsut, ).
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Susan Cloer, Alexander Sweatt, Glenda Sweatt. (lsut, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CSX Transportation Inc, Bobby Odom, Town of McColl (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8481822), filed by Susan Cloer, Alexander Sweatt, Glenda Sweatt. (lsut, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cloer et al v. CSX Transportation Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Odom
Represented By: Gregory Heath Ohanesian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of McColl
Represented By: Gregory Heath Ohanesian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation Inc
Represented By: Ronald K Wray, II
Represented By: James Andrew Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Cloer
Represented By: Eric Chalmers Poston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Sweatt
Represented By: Eric Chalmers Poston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Sweatt
Represented By: Eric Chalmers Poston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?