United Property & Casualty Insurance v. Chaney et al
Plaintiff: United Property & Casualty Insurance
Defendant: Steven Rodney Chaney and Catherine Juleen Johnson Chaney
Case Number: 4:2019cv01600
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 20 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Catherine Juleen Johnson Chaney.(McCoy, Daniel)
July 31, 2019 Filing 19 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 7/31/2019. (cbru, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 18 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 9/3/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/30/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/29/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/2/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/2/2019, Discovery due by 1/27/2020, Motion in Limine due by 5/11/2020, Motions due by 2/11/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 4/27/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 6/1/2020, Mediation Due by 4/13/2020. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 7/31/2019. (cbru, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE: Defendant Catherine Juleen Johnson Chaney is reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed at the time a party first appears. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than August 14, 2019. (cbru, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against United Property & Casualty Insurance by Catherine Juleen Johnson Chaney.(McCoy, Daniel) Modified to edit text on 7/31/2019 (cbru, ).
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 13. Reason: Duplicate of entry #12. (cbru, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Steven Rodney Chaney answer due 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service on Steven Chaney)(LaFave, Mary) (Main Document 12 replaced on 7/24/2019) (cbru, ). Modified to edit text on 7/24/2019 (cbru, ).
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 7/23/2019. (cbru, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 8. Reason: Attorney refiled instead of submitting corrected document via email as directed. Corrected Filing Document Number #9 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: N/A - Correction made on same date as original filing. Response due date modified to that of original filing: N/A - Correction made on same date as original filing. (cbru, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Steven Rodney Chaney by Catherine Juleen Johnson Chaney, Steven Rodney Chaney. Response to Motion due by 8/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(McCoy, Daniel)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. (Catherine Juleen Johnson Chaney answer due 7/31/2019; Steven Rodney Chaney answer due 7/31/2019) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 7/10/2019.(cbru, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Catherine Juleen Johnson Chaney, Steven Rodney Chaney. Response to Motion due by 7/23/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(McCoy, Daniel) Modified to link correct event to associated event on 7/10/2019 (cbru, ).
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Property & Casualty Insurance. Catherine Juleen Johnson Chaney served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (LaFave, Mary) (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/27/2019) (cbru, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2019: #1 Proof of Service) (cbru, ).
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Catherine Juleen Johnson Chaney, Steven Rodney Chaney. (cbru, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United Property & Casualty Insurance.(cbru, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Catherine Juleen Johnson Chaney, Steven Rodney Chaney (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8482152) filed by United Property & Casualty Insurance. Service due by 9/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Coverage Disclaimer)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Property & Casualty Insurance v. Chaney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Rodney Chaney
Represented By: Daniel Ray McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Juleen Johnson Chaney
Represented By: Dirk J Derrick
Represented By: Daniel Ray McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Property & Casualty Insurance
Represented By: Mary Daniel LaFave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?