State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Winyah Land & Timber, Inc et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant: Winyah Land & Timber, Inc, Henry Swinton, Mimmie Boykin Warner, Moris Johnson and Kenneth Reaves
Case Number: 4:2019cv01606
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE for 8/6/2019 10:00 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by the Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 06/28/2019. (lsut, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/18/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/11/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/7/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/5/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/25/2019, Discovery due by 12/27/2019, Motion in Limine due by 2/24/2020, Motions due by 1/8/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 03/03/2020, Bench Trial Deadline 3/24/2020, Mediation Due by 1/22/2020. Signed by the Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 06/28/2019. (lsut, ) Modified on 7/1/2019 to edit text (lsut, ).
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mimmie Boykin Warner.(Hatfield, William)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Winyah Land & Timber, Inc waiver executed on 6/6/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Johnsen, Jennifer) (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/20/2019) (lsut, ). (Attachment: #1 Waiver of Service - Winyah Land & Timber Inc) (lsut, ). Modified on 6/20/2019 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user (lsut, ).
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Moris Johnson, Kenneth Reaves, Henry Swinton, Mimmie Boykin Warner, Winyah Land & Timber, Inc. Service due by 9/3/2019. (lsut, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (lsut, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Moris Johnson, Kenneth Reaves, Henry Swinton, Mimmie Boykin Warner, Winyah Land & Timber, Inc (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8483341), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 List of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint in Underlying Action, #3 Exhibit B - State Farm Policy 191 1415-A07-401, #4 Exhibit C - State Farm Policy 415 7534 A07 40U) (lsut, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Winyah Land & Timber, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winyah Land & Timber, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Swinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mimmie Boykin Warner
Represented By: William P Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moris Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Reaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer E Johnsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?