Renciu v. South Carolina Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Radu Renciu
Defendant: Warden Cecilia Reynolds, SGT. Brown, South Carolina Department of Corrections and Major Bernadette P Richardson
Case Number: 4:2019cv01773
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Henry M Herlong
2 Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
3 Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 23 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Bernadette P Richardson.(Arthur, Samuel)
August 13, 2019 Filing 22 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker: Global Status Conference held on 8/13/2019. Court Reporter Virginia Druce, CourtSmart. (hhil, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Hearing: Global Status Conference set for 8/13/2019 10:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #6, U. S. Court House, 85 Broad St, Charleston before Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker. The District Judges have assigned all of the cases alleging systemic prison violence at SCDC, brought by the Bell Legal Group, to Judge Baker for pretrial handling. At the global status conference, Judge Baker will discuss how these cases will be handled moving forward. (hada, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 20 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by SGT. Brown.(Holler, David)
July 30, 2019 Filing 19 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Cecilia Reynolds, South Carolina Department of Corrections.(Thomas, Lisa)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/21/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/24/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/22/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/21/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/21/2020, Discovery due by 4/21/2020, Motion in Limine due by 8/4/2020, Motions due by 5/6/2020, Pretrial Briefs due by 8/18/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 8/25/2020, Mediation Due by 7/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 07/30/2019. (hada, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 17 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Radu Renciu.(Bell, James)
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Radu Renciu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Consent Amended Scheduling Order)(Bell, James)
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker. Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III no longer assigned to the case. NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER: Please note the case number for this action has changed to 4:19-cv-1773-MGL-MGB. (bshr, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Bernadette P Richardson.(Arthur, Samuel)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Cecilia Reynolds, South Carolina Department of Corrections.(Thomas, Lisa)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Radu Renciu.(Bell, James) (Main Document 12 replaced on 7/2/2019 with document provided by filing user) (dsto)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Arlene Thomas on behalf of Cecilia Reynolds, South Carolina Department of Corrections (Thomas, Lisa)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER Entry #9 Reason: Filed in error by attorney. Clerk added to Entry #1 as additional attachments. (dsto, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/16/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/30/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 7/30/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/26/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/24/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/24/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/24/2019, Discovery due by 12/23/2019, Motions due by 1/7/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 3/23/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 4/27/2020, Mediation Due by 3/9/2020. Motions in limine must be filed at no later than April 6, 2020. Written responses are due seven (7) days thereafter. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 06/26/2019. (dsto, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Bernadette P Richardson.(Arthur, Samuel) Modified on 6/27/2019 to edit text.(dsto)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel F Arthur, III on behalf of Bernadette P Richardson (Arthur, Samuel)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis. Honorable Henry M. Herlong, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (bshr, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by SGT. Brown. (dsto, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by SGT. Brown.(dsto, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lee County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-31-160. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8518289), filed by SGT. Brown. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(dsto, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2019: #2 Answer of SCDC and Reynolds) (dsto, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Renciu v. South Carolina Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Cecilia Reynolds
Represented By: Lisa Arlene Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT. Brown
Represented By: David Cornwell Holler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Corrections
Represented By: Lisa Arlene Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Bernadette P Richardson
Represented By: Samuel F Arthur, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radu Renciu
Represented By: Victoria S H Knight
Represented By: James Edward Bell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?