Green v. Hixson et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Green
Defendant: Horry County, Jimmy A. Richardson, III and Scott Hixson
Case Number: 4:2019cv01797
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Referring Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 OBJECTION to #8 Report and Recommendation by Gregory Green. Reply to Objections due by 8/21/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bgoo)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #7 Order placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Gregory Green, 196495, Manning Correctional Institution, 502 Beckman Dr., Columbia, SC 29203 (bgoo)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the #1 Complaint be dismissed without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 8/6/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 7/23/2019. (bgoo)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350. Motion granted: #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 7/23/2019. (bgoo)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Gregory Green. Response to Motion due by 7/9/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate, #2 Envelope) Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett. (bgoo)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gregory Green. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (bgoo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Hixson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horry County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy A. Richardson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Hixson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?