Smith v. Sheriff's Office of Dillon County et al
Plaintiff: Karin Smith
Defendant: Sheriff's Office of Dillon County, Micah Chaddie Hayes and Luke Brunson
Case Number: 4:2019cv01801
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/31/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/31/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/29/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/1/2020, Discovery due by 4/30/2020, Motions due by 5/31/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/31/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 9/1/2020, Mediation Due by 7/15/2020. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to September 1, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 08/12/2019. (dsto, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Rule 26(f) Report by Luke Brunson, Micah Chaddie Hayes, Sheriff's Office of Dillon County. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Amended Scheduling Order. Proposed Order has been emailed to chambers)(Morgan, H)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/22/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/5/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 8/5/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/30/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/29/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/2/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/2/2019, Discovery due by 1/27/2020, Motions due by 2/11/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 4/27/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 6/1/2020, ADR Statement due by 3/13/2020, Mediation Due by 4/13/2020. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to June 1, 2020.Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 07/01/2019. (dsto, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Luke Brunson, Micah Chaddie Hayes, Sheriff's Office of Dillon County. (dsto, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Luke Brunson, Micah Chaddie Hayes, Sheriff's Office of Dillon County.(dsto, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dillon County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-CP-17-053. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8523727), filed by Micah Chaddie Hayes, Sheriff's Office of Dillon County, Luke Brunson. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Sheriff's Office of Dillon County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karin Smith
Represented By: Everett J Mercer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff's Office of Dillon County
Represented By: H Thomas Morgan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micah Chaddie Hayes
Represented By: H Thomas Morgan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Brunson
Represented By: H Thomas Morgan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?