Powell v. Pressley et al
Plaintiff: Derrick Powell
Defendant: Lt. Travis Pressley, Ofc. Kevin Harley, Ofc. Tracey Howard and Sgt. Tommy Robertson
Case Number: 4:2019cv01818
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Referring Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kevin Harley, Tracey Howard, Travis Pressley, Tommy Robertson, filed by Derrick Powell. Service due by 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dsto, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Derrick Powell (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dsto, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #7 Proper Form Order w/NEF, original Complaint, (4)Summons and (4)USM-285s, 8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Derrick Powell, #377461, PCI, 430 Oaklawn Road, Pelzer, SC, 29669 (dsto, )
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per #7 Proper Form Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 08/05/2019.(dsto, )
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 8/26/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 08/05/2019. (dsto, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (dsto, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Derrick Powell. Response to Motion due by 7/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(dsto, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kevin Harley, Tracey Howard, Travis Pressley, Tommy Robertson, filed by Derrick Powell. Service due by 9/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. Pressley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Travis Pressley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofc. Kevin Harley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofc. Tracey Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Tommy Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?