Wright v. Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: William Wright
Defendant: Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01888
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by William Wright (Bland, Chauntel)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 7/29/2019. (cbru, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement by William Wright (Bland, Chauntel)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Wright. Wakefield & Associates, Inc. served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Bland, Chauntel)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Wakefield & Associates, Inc. (cbru, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by William Wright.(cbru, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wakefield & Associates, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8537581) filed by William Wright. Service due by 9/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Wright
Represented By: Chauntel Demetrius Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?