Grant v. Protective Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Kevin Grant
Defendant: Protective Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv01987
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26 Report due by 8/21/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/16/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/14/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/14/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/14/2020, Discovery due by 7/12/2020, Motions due by 7/26/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 9/10/2020, ADR Statement due by 7/26/2020, Mediation Due by 8/26/2020. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to date set for jury selection. Responses to motions in limine shall be filed within seven (7) days after the motion is filed. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after 11/03/2020. Signed by Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell on 08/22/2019. (lsut, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Protective Insurance Company.(Highfield, Duke)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Protective Insurance Company.(Highfield, Duke)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 Rule 26(f) Report by Protective Insurance Company.(Highfield, Duke)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Kevin Grant.(Sullivan, Allison)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/7/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/21/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 8/21/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/16/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/15/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/16/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/16/2019, Discovery due by 2/13/2020, Motions due by 2/28/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/13/2020, ADR Statement due by 3/28/2020, Mediation Due by 4/28/2020. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to date for jury selection. Responses to motions in limine shall be filed within seven (7) days after the motion is filed. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after 07/06/2020. Signed by Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell on 07/18/2019. (lsut, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Protective Insurance Company. (lsut, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Protective Insurance Company. (lsut, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-33-00424 (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8561002), filed by Protective Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents) (lsut, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant v. Protective Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Grant
Represented By: Allison Paige Sullivan
Represented By: Rodney Clark Jernigan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Protective Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey James Wiseman
Represented By: Duke Raleigh Highfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?