Danny Group, LLC et al v. City of Myrtle Beach et al
Plaintiff: Mohammed Karam, Blazian Promotions & Company, LLC, Natalie Trota-Litsey, Danny Group, LLC, Hector Melendez and Elmadani M Karam
Defendant: David Sebok, Myrtle Beach Downtown Redevelopment Corporation, John Pederson and City of Myrtle Beach
Case Number: 4:2019cv02087
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 17 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Myrtle Beach Downtown Redevelopment Corporation, David Sebok.(Connor, Andrew)
September 13, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/15/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/12/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/11/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/1/2020, Discovery due by 4/29/2020, Motion in Limine due by 7/1/2020, Motions due by 5/13/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/8/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 8/5/2020, Mediation Due by 5/27/2020, Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 9/13/2019. (abuc)
September 10, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE ENTRY: The Court held a telephonic Rule 16 Conference with the parties. The parties are directed to submit a Proposed Amended Scheduling Order and responses to Local Rule 26.03 interrogatories within 14 days. Proceedings held before Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr: Pretrial Conference held on 9/10/2019. (abuc)
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by James Richard Battle, II on behalf of City of Myrtle Beach, John Pederson (Battle, James)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Thomas C Brittain for 9/9/19-9/12/19, 9/16/19-9/20/19, 10/17/19-10/27/19, 11/19/19-11/21/19 (Brittain, Thomas)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by David Sebok.(Connor, Andrew)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Myrtle Beach Downtown Redevelopment Corporation.(Connor, Andrew)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Horry County County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court)(Connor, Andrew)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE for 9/10/2019 02:00 PM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Defendants counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by the Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 08/01/2019. (lsut, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/21/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/15/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/12/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/9/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/30/2019, Discovery due by 1/28/2020, Motion in Limine due by 3/30/2020, Motions due by 2/11/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 4/6/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 4/27/2020, Mediation Due by 2/25/2020. Signed by the Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 08/01/2019. (lsut, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by City of Myrtle Beach, John Pederson.(Battle, Michael)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by City of Myrtle Beach, John Pederson.(Battle, Michael)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by David Sebok. (lsut, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Myrtle Beach Downtown Redevelopment Corporation. (lsut, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Horry County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-26-01837 (fFiling fee $400 receipt number 0420-8579716), filed by Myrtle Beach Downtown Redevelopment Corporation, David Sebok. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filing, #2 Exhibit B - Consent to Removal by Defendants City of Myrtle Beach and John Pederson) (lsut, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Danny Group, LLC et al v. City of Myrtle Beach et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed Karam
Represented By: Tucker S Player
Represented By: Thomas C Brittain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blazian Promotions & Company, LLC
Represented By: Tucker S Player
Represented By: Thomas C Brittain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Trota-Litsey
Represented By: Tucker S Player
Represented By: Thomas C Brittain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Group, LLC
Represented By: Tucker S Player
Represented By: Thomas C Brittain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Melendez
Represented By: Tucker S Player
Represented By: Thomas C Brittain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmadani M Karam
Represented By: Tucker S Player
Represented By: Thomas C Brittain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sebok
Represented By: Andrew Marvin Connor
Represented By: Susan P MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myrtle Beach Downtown Redevelopment Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Marvin Connor
Represented By: Susan P MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Pederson
Represented By: Michael Warner Battle
Represented By: James Richard Battle, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Myrtle Beach
Represented By: Michael Warner Battle
Represented By: James Richard Battle, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?