Davis v. Holloway et al
Plaintiff: Quintin LaPrix Davis
Defendant: Everett Eugene McMillian, Carrie Fisher Sherard, Justin William Holloway and Christopher Dolan Taylor
Case Number: 4:2019cv03037
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 14 OBJECTION to #11 Report and Recommendation by Quintin LaPrix Davis. Reply to Objections due by 12/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(prou, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: #11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION w/NEF, #9 Order - 1983 - No Service w/NEF, 10 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Quintin LaPrix Davis, #29617, Florence County Detention Center, 6719 Friendfield Road, Effingham, SC 29541. (prou, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The undersigned recommends that the court dismiss the complaint without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 11/15/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 11/1/2019. (prou, )
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per #9 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 11/1/2019.(prou, )
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 11/1/2019. (prou, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Florence. (prou, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Quintin LaPrix Davis. Response to Motion due by 11/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Justin William Holloway, Everett Eugene McMillian, Carrie Fisher Sherard, Christopher Dolan Taylor, filed by Quintin LaPrix Davis. Service due by 1/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(prou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Holloway et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everett Eugene McMillian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Fisher Sherard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin William Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Dolan Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quintin LaPrix Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?