Cranford v. Myrtle Beach, South Carolina, City of et al
Plaintiff: Bryan Cranford
Defendant: Does 1-5, Hugh Jones, Tim Balch and Myrtle Beach, South Carolina, City of
Case Number: 4:2019cv03086
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 12/16/2019.(cbru, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Jonathan Markese (Filing fee $250 receipt number 0420-8828982) by Bryan Cranford. Response to Motion due by 12/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application/Affidavit and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)No proposed order.(Harms, Samuel) Modified to edit text on 12/16/2019 (cbru, ).
December 9, 2019 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 12/9/2019.(cbru, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 13 Additional Attachments to Main Document #9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Frederick Herbert Nelson ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8800808). First attachment description: Certificate of Good Standing Florida Supreme Court . (Harms, Samuel)
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 12/2/2019. (cbru, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 1/6/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/31/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/2/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/31/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/31/2020, Discovery due by 6/1/2020, Motion in Limine due by 9/11/2020, Motions due by 6/15/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 8/28/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 10/2/2020, Mediation Due by 8/13/2020. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 12/2/2019. (cbru, )
November 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Frederick Herbert Nelson ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8800808) by Bryan Cranford. Response to Motion due by 12/13/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission by Frederick Nelson, #2 Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Frederick Nelson)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Harms, Samuel) Additional attachment filed as entry #13 on 12/9/2019 (cbru, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/9/2019) (cbru, ).
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tim Balch, Hugh Jones, Myrtle Beach, South Carolina, City of.(Battle, Michael)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tim Balch, Hugh Jones, Myrtle Beach, South Carolina, City of.(Battle, Michael)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Hugh Jones. (cbru, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Tim Balch. (cbru, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Myrtle Beach, South Carolina, City of. (cbru, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Bryan Cranford.(cbru, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tim Balch, Does 1-5, Hugh Jones, Myrtle Beach, South Carolina, City of (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8752011) filed by Bryan Cranford. Service due by 1/29/2020(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cranford v. Myrtle Beach, South Carolina, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh Jones
Represented By: Michael Warner Battle
Represented By: James Richard Battle, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Balch
Represented By: Michael Warner Battle
Represented By: James Richard Battle, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myrtle Beach, South Carolina, City of
Represented By: Michael Warner Battle
Represented By: James Richard Battle, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Cranford
Represented By: Samuel Darryl Harms, III
Represented By: David Jonathan Markese
Represented By: Frederick Herbert Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?