Matthews et al v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Matthews and Jacquelyn L. Matthews
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03091
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Wright Medical Technology, Inc..(Lydon, Thomas)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Wright Medical Technology, Inc..(Lydon, Thomas)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE by Jacquelyn L. Matthews, Jeffrey Matthews. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. waiver executed on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executed Waiver of Service of the Summons)(Kennedy, Joseph) Modified to edit text on 11/15/2019 (cbru, ).
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacquelyn L. Matthews. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. served on 11/7/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service of Process)(Kennedy, Joseph)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (cbru, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jacquelyn L. Matthews, Jeffrey Matthews.(cbru, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8752563) filed by Jacquelyn L. Matthews, Jeffrey Matthews. Service due by 1/29/2020(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthews et al v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Matthews
Represented By: Joseph Jakob Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn L. Matthews
Represented By: Joseph Jakob Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas E Lydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?