Spain et al v. Speedway, LLC
Plaintiff: Robert Spain and Susan Spain
Defendant: Speedway, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv03250
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Referring Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 17 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Robert Spain, Susan Spain.(Wilson, Ralph)
January 13, 2020 Filing 16 CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/21/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/20/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/5/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/18/2020, Discovery due by 7/17/2020, Motion in Limine due by 10/30/2020, Motions due by 8/3/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 10/16/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 11/1/2020, Mediation Due by 10/2/2020. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 01/13/2020. (lsut, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 15 Case Reassigned to Judge Sherri A Lydon. Judge Mary Geiger Lewis no longer assigned to the case. (suro, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 14 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Speedway, LLC.(Crites, J)
December 24, 2019 Filing 13 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Robert Spain, Susan Spain.(Wilson, Ralph)
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Susan Spain, Robert Spain .(Wilson, Ralph) Modified to add filer listed on document on 12/5/2019 (cbru, ).
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiffs are reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed no later than 14 days after service of the notice of removal. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than December 18, 2019. (cbru, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Horry County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acknowledgement of Removal)(Crites, J)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 11/21/2019. (cbru, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 12/27/2029, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/21/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/18/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/19/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/19/2020, Discovery due by 5/18/2020, Motion in Limine due by 8/31/2020, Motions due by 6/2/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 8/17/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 9/21/2020, Mediation Due by 8/3/2020. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 11/21/2019. (cbru, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Speedway, LLC.(Crites, J)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Speedway, LLC.(cbru, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Horry County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-26-06657 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8782585) filed by Speedway, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State of Delaware confirmation pages)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spain et al v. Speedway, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Spain
Represented By: Ralph James Wilson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Spain
Represented By: Ralph James Wilson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway, LLC
Represented By: J Bennett Crites, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?