Nutrien Ag Solutions Inc v. Jordan et al
Plaintiff: Nutrien Ag Solutions Inc
Defendant: ArborOne ACA and Russell Jordan
Case Number: 4:2019cv03431
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Filing 12 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Russell Jordan.(Thompson, Philip)
January 23, 2020 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by ArborOne ACA.(Wallace, R)
January 23, 2020 Filing 9 Arborone, ACA's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Russell Jordan by ArborOne ACA.(Wallace, R)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/29/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/12/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 2/12/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/8/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/8/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/8/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/8/2020, Discovery due by 8/6/2020, Motions due by 8/21/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 11/4/2020, ADR Statement due by 9/20/2020, Mediation Due by 10/20/2020. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to The date set for jury selection. Responses to motions in limine shall be filed within seven (7) days after the motion is filed. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after 12/7/2020. Signed by Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell on 1/9/2020. (hcic, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Russell Jordan.(Thompson, Philip)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by ArborOne ACA. ArborOne ACA served on 1/2/2020, answer due 1/23/2020. (Grigg, Suzanne)
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ArborOne ACA, Russell Jordan. Service due by 3/9/2020. (hcic, )
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Nutrien Ag Solutions Inc. (hcic, )
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ArborOne ACA, Russell Jordan (filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8819190), filed by Nutrien Ag Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agrium Credit Application, #2 Exhibit B - Approval Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Terms and Conditions, #4 Exhibit D - No Payments Made, #5 Exhibit E - Application, Master Note, Security Agreement, #6 Exhibit F - Loan Commitment and Revision, #7 Exhibit G - UCC All Products, #8 Exhibit H - No Payments Made, #9 Exhibit I - Balance Due, #10 Exhibit J - UCC #3360, #11 Exhibit K - Purchases)(hcic, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nutrien Ag Solutions Inc v. Jordan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ArborOne ACA
Represented By: R Bruce Wallace
Represented By: Suzanne Taylor Graham Grigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Jordan
Represented By: Philip C Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nutrien Ag Solutions Inc
Represented By: Joshua Robert Hinson
Represented By: Robert P Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?