Eglit v. Burney et al
Plaintiff: Robert A Eglit, Jr.
Defendant: John Burney, MD, Healthcare Partners of SC, Inc, Conway Hospital, Inc and United States, The
Case Number: 4:2020cv00124
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Filing 12 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Robert A Eglit, Jr.(Winslow, Thomas)
February 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Thomas William Winslow for 2/24/2020-2/28/2020,3/19/2020-3/22/2020,4/20/2020-5/3/2020,9/17/2020-9/21/2020 (Winslow, Thomas)
February 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Lee Ellis Berlinsky for April 6-9, 2020; June 22-26, 2020; July 6-10 and 13-17, 2020 (Berlinsky, Lee)
February 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Marian Williams Scalise for 3/25/2020-3/27/2020; 5/7/2020-5/8/2020; 5/21/2020-6/1/2020; 7/9/2020-7/10/2020; 9/29/2020-10/15/2020 (Scalise, Marian)
February 18, 2020 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Conway Hospital, Inc.(Scalise, Marian)
February 11, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by United States, The (Berlinsky, Lee). Modified on 2/20/2020 to correct event type. (prou, )
January 30, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Substitute Party. United States, The added. John Burney, MD and Healthcare Partners of SC, Inc terminated. Signed by the Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 1/30/2020. (lgib, )
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Substitute Party by John Burney, MD, Healthcare Partners of SC, Inc. Response to Motion due by 1/24/2020. No proposed order. (lsut, )
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by John Burney, MD, Healthcare Partners of SC, Inc. (lsut, )
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Horry County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-26-05267, filed by Healthcare Partners of SC, Inc, John Burney, MD. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents - Summons and Complaint, #2 State Court Documents - Answer on Behalf of Conway Hospital, Inc. dba Conway Medical Center) (lsut, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eglit v. Burney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A Eglit, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas William Winslow
Represented By: Allison Dawn Argoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Burney, MD
Represented By: Lee Ellis Berlinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthcare Partners of SC, Inc
Represented By: Lee Ellis Berlinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conway Hospital, Inc
Represented By: Marian Williams Scalise
Represented By: Lydia L Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States, The
Represented By: Lee Ellis Berlinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?