Nygaard et al v. Beach House Hospitality Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Holly Nygaard and Quanell Gee
Defendant: Beach House Hospitality Group LLC and Eric Sukarchi
Case Number: 4:2020cv00233
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 203
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Filing 9 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Holly Nygaard, Quanell Gee. All Defendants. (Miller, Bruce)
March 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF JOINDER by Bruce E Miller on behalf of Quanell Gee, Holly Nygaard (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Consent of Moss)(Miller, Bruce)
February 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF JOINDER by Bruce E Miller on behalf of Quanell Gee, Holly Nygaard (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Consent of A. McColgan, #2 Certificate of Service)(Miller, Bruce)
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JOINDER by Bruce E Miller on behalf of Quanell Gee, Holly Nygaard (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Consent of A. Powers, #2 Certificate of Service)(Miller, Bruce)
February 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF JOINDER by Bruce E Miller on behalf of Quanell Gee, Holly Nygaard (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Consent of V. Miller, #2 Certificate of Service)(Miller, Bruce)
January 23, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Beach House Hospitality Group LLC, Eric Sukarchi. Service due by 4/22/2020. (hcic, )
January 23, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Quanell Gee, Holly Nygaard. (hcic, )
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Beach House Hospitality Group LLC, Eric Sukarchi (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8901617), filed by Holly Nygaard, Quanell Gee. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Join Lawsuit, #2 Consent to Join Lawsuit) (hcic, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nygaard et al v. Beach House Hospitality Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Nygaard
Represented By: Bruce E Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quanell Gee
Represented By: Bruce E Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beach House Hospitality Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Sukarchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?