Wolfe v. Churray et al
Plaintiff: Michael E Wolfe
Defendant: L Harris, Nfn Early, Kathy Wyant, Nfn Perks, Nfn Toth, Nfn Churray, Nfn McRee, Donna Ashley-Harouff, Jiimmy Pacheo, Officer Kayla Shervey, Nfn Caldwell, Nfn Glen, Thomas Overman, Nfn Osborne, Nfn Moccabello, Nfn Welch, Amy Enloe and Nfn Lasley
Case Number: 4:2020cv00244
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Bruce Hayden on behalf of Nfn Osborne, Thomas Overman (Hayden, Zachary)
March 24, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara A Chesley on behalf of Nfn Osborne, Thomas Overman (Chesley, Barbara)
March 18, 2020 Filing 18 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: 17 TEXT Order on Motion to Withdraw, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Michael E. Wolfe, #346590, KCI, 4848 Goldmine Hwy., Kershaw, SC, 29067 (dsto, )
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff filed this action on January 24, 2020. On March 9, 2020, Plaintiff voluntarily dismissed Defendants Early and Overman. On March 13, 2020 Plaintiff filed a document with the court asking to withdraw his request and reinstate these two defendants (ECF No. #16 ). This motion is being treated as a motion to amend his complaint which is granted to the extent the two named defendants, Early and Overman, are added back to the docket. The allegations and all Defendants remain the same as the original complaint ECF No. #1 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 03/18/2020.(dsto, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Returned Unexecuted (Restricted Access) as to Nfn Welch (could not find). (dsto, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Returned Unexecuted (Restricted Access) as to Nfn Moccabello (could not find). (dsto, )
March 13, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw by Michael E Wolfe. Response to Motion due by 3/27/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(dsto, )
March 9, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Partial Dismissal of Defendants (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dsto, )
February 13, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Donna Ashley-Harouff, Nfn Caldwell, Nfn Churray, Nfn Early, Amy Enloe, Nfn Glen, L Harris, Nfn Lasley, Nfn McRee, Nfn Moccabello, Nfn Osborne, Thomas Overman, Jiimmy Pacheo, Nfn Perks, Kayla Shervey, Nfn Toth, Nfn Welch, Kathy Wyant. Service due by 5/13/2020. (dsto, )
February 13, 2020 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #7 Order 1983 w/NEF, 8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Michael E. Wolfe, #346590, KCI, 4848 Goldmine Hwy., Kershaw, SC, 29067 (dsto, )
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per #7 Serve Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 02/13/2020.(dsto, )
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER authorizing service of process and collection of filing fee. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350.00. Plaintiff is also directed to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 02/13/2020. (dsto, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (prou, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Michael E Wolfe. Response to Motion due by 2/7/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate, #2 Declaration of Michael E. Wolfe, #3 Envelopes)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(prou, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Donna Ashley-Harouff, Nfn Caldwell, Nfn Churray, Nfn Early, Amy Enloe, Nfn Glen, L Harris, Nfn Lasley, Nfn McRee, Nfn Moccabello, Nfn Osborne, Thomas Overman, Jiimmy Pacheo, Nfn Perks, Kayla Shervey, Nfn Toth, Nfn Welch, Kathy Wyant, filed by Michael E Wolfe. Service due by 4/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Notice and Request for Service, #3 Envelopes)(prou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolfe v. Churray et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nfn Early
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Wyant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nfn Perks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nfn Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nfn Churray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nfn McRee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Ashley-Harouff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jiimmy Pacheo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Kayla Shervey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nfn Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nfn Glen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Overman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nfn Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nfn Moccabello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nfn Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Enloe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nfn Lasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?