Butcher et al v. Sagepost LLC et al
Plaintiff: Garry Lee Butcher and Samantha S Butcher
Defendant: Sagepost LLC, Parasail Vessel, Captain Blake and Sage Sailing Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv01207
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. The Court will conduct a Rule 16 Telephone Conference on 7/8/2020 11:30 AM before the Honorable Sherri A. Lydon. Plaintiffs counsel is to initiate the call and have all parties on the line before calling the Court at (843) 292-5650. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 5/11/2020. (lgib, )
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 6/1/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 6/25/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/27/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/19/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/18/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/8/2020, Discovery due by 11/9/2020, Motion in Limine due by 1/6/2021, Motions due by 11/23/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 1/15/2021, Bench Trial Deadline 2/5/2021, Mediation Due by 12/7/2020. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 5/11/2020. (lgib, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Captain Blake, Parasail Vessel, Sage Sailing Inc, Sagepost LLC.(Moore, E)
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Captain Blake, Parasail Vessel, Sage Sailing Inc, Sagepost LLC.(Moore, E)
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Captain Blake, Sage Sailing Inc, Sagepost LLC. Service due by 6/29/2020. (lgib, )
March 25, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Garry Lee Butcher, Samantha S Butcher. (lgib, )
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Captain Blake, Parasail Vessel, Sage Sailing Inc, Sagepost LLC (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9019821), filed by Samantha S Butcher, Garry Lee Butcher. (Attachments: #1 Verification) (lgib, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butcher et al v. Sagepost LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sagepost LLC
Represented By: E Raymond Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parasail Vessel
Represented By: E Raymond Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Blake
Represented By: E Raymond Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sage Sailing Inc
Represented By: E Raymond Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garry Lee Butcher
Represented By: S Scott Bluestein
Represented By: Ian D Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha S Butcher
Represented By: S Scott Bluestein
Represented By: Ian D Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?