United States of America v. Cooper et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Raymond Cooper, ADM Processing, Raymond SL Cooper, Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC and Helen Mcfadden
Case Number: 4:2020cv02201
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Raymond Cooper. (hcic, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT byUnited States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Affidavit in Support)(Ryan, Katherine)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. ADM Processing served on 7/1/2020, answer due 7/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Service)(Ryan, Katherine)
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Raymond Cooper served on 6/17/2020, answer due 7/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Service)(Ryan, Katherine)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Helen Mcfadden served on 6/22/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Service)(Ryan, Katherine)
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ADM Processing, Raymond Cooper, Helen Mcfadden, Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Service due by 9/9/2020 (hcic, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America. (hcic, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United States of America.(hcic, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ADM Processing, Raymond Cooper, Helen Mcfadden, Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Legal Description, #2 Exhibit 2, Promissory Notes, #3 Exhibit 3, Mortgages)(hcic, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Cooper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADM Processing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond SL Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Mcfadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Katherine McLean Ryan
Represented By: Walker Heinitsh Willcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?