Gilson v. Dobbs
Petitioner: Joshua Lee Gilson
Respondent: Brian Dobbs
Case Number: 4:2020cv02642
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joshua Lee Gilson (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dsto, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #8 Proper Form Order w/NEF and AO240, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Joshua Lee Gilson, #91853-083, FCIW, PO Box 340, Salters, SC, 29590 (dsto, )
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 8/11/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 07/21/2020. (dsto, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00266. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 16, 2020 Case transferred to District of District of South Carolina. Original file electronically sent. (afar) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 7/16/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER: it is ORDERED that the above-captioned case shall be, and hereby is, TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Transfer Order to Petitioner and to effectuate the transfer of this case to the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina.Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 7/16/20. (afar) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 7/16/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 Acknowledgment of Receipt. (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 7/16/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION, Conditionally filed (SUBJECT TO DEFECT) for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 0.00.), filed by Joshua Lee Gilson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 7/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilson v. Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joshua Lee Gilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?