Patel et al v. Cuccinelli
Plaintiff: Aanal Narendrakumar Patel and Narendrakumar Rasiklal Patel
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Case Number: 4:2020cv02816
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Drake on behalf of Kenneth Cuccinelli (Drake, Beth)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aanal Narendrakumar Patel, Narendrakumar Rasiklal Patel. Kenneth Cuccinelli served on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service)(Banias, Bradley)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kenneth Cuccinelli. Service due by 11/3/2020. (lgib, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Aanal Narendrakumar Patel, Narendrakumar Rasiklal Patel. (lgib, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kenneth Cuccinelli (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9254628), filed by Aanal Narendrakumar Patel, Narendrakumar Rasiklal Patel. (lgib, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel et al v. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Represented By: Beth Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aanal Narendrakumar Patel
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Narendrakumar Rasiklal Patel
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?