Thompson Construction Group Inc et al v. Boyd
Appellant: Roy Laverne Bolyn and Thompson Construction Group Inc
Appellee: Thomas Levi Boyd
Trustee: Pamela Simmons-Beasley
Interested Party: Bankruptcy Court
Case Number: 4:2020cv02854
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Appeals Response filed by Roy Laverne Bolyn, Thompson Construction Group Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/9/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Summerall, Charles)
September 22, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing on #13 Motion to Dismiss Appeals by Thomas Levi Boyd. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2020 at 10:00 A.M. in Florence #3, McMillan Federal Bldg. 401 W Evans Street, Florence, SC before the Honorable Sherri A. Lydon. (lgib, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 Letter from John B Butler III re Scheduling of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Appeals. (Butler, John)
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Appeals by Thomas Levi Boyd. Response to Motion due by 10/2/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service Of Motion and Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A Motion to Reopen Case, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B Order Reopening Case, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C Test Order Denying Motion in Limine, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D Order Denying Motion to Reconsider, #6 Memo in Support Memorandum of Law, #7 Exhibit Unpublished Opinion)No proposed order.(Butler, John)
September 16, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Libby B. Berry re #11 Notice of Appearance by Thomas Levi Boyd. (Butler, John)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John B Butler, III on behalf of Thomas Levi Boyd (Butler, John)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Consent Motion to Consolidate Appeals, Dismiss the Trustee as a Party, Extend Briefing Schedule, and Increase Page Limitation. The three related appeals are hereby consolidated per Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8003(b)(2); the trustee is DISMISSED as a party to the appeal; and the page limit for principal briefs (both for Appellants and Appellee) is increased to 50 pages and the page limit for the reply brief is increased to 20 pages. Additionally, the briefing schedule is extended as follows: Appellants brief is due by December 3, 2020, Appellee's brief is due 45 days after the filing of Appellants' brief, and Appellants' reply brief is due 21 days after the filing of Appellee's brief. Signed by Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 9/11/2020. (mcot, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Roy Laverne Bolyn, Thompson Construction Group Inc. (Summerall, Charles)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, #3 Bankruptcy Appeal, 5 Bankruptcy Scheduling Notice,, #2 Bankruptcy Appeal Consent Motion to Consolidate Appeals, Dismiss the Trustee as a Party, Extend Briefing Scheduling, and Increase Page Limitation by Roy Laverne Bolyn, Thompson Construction Group Inc. Response to Motion due by 9/23/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Summerall, Charles)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 SCHEDULING NOTICE: The Designated Record from the United States Bankruptcy Court was filed in this court on 9/3/2020. The Appellants shall serve and file their brief within thirty (30) days from the date of this notice pursuant to Rule 8018(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. The Appellees shall serve and file their brief within thirty (30) days after the service and filing of the Appellants brief. Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8018(a)(2). The Appellant may serve and file a Reply Brief within fourteen (14) days after the service and filing of the Appellees Brief. (lgib, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 DESIGNATED RECORD(BANKRUPTCY) by Bankruptcy Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, #3 Bankruptcy Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet and Designated Record on Appeal, #2 Continued Designated Record on Appeal, #3 Continued Designated Record on Appeal - previous case)(sphipps-USBK, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT of Order (a) denying Motion to Reconsider, Alter, or Amend the Courts April 26, 2020 Order granting Debtors Motion to Reopen Case, (b) overruling an Objection to Exemption, and (c) overruling Objection to Debtors Application to Employ. Bankruptcy Court case number 13-02924-jw, filed by Roy Laverne Bolyn, Thompson Construction Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal) (lgib, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT - Order Denying Motion in Limine. Bankruptcy Court case number 13-02924-jw, filed by Roy Laverne Bolyn, Thompson Construction Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal) (lgib, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT for Order granting Debtor's Motion to Reopen Case. Bankruptcy Court case number 13-02924-jw, filed by Roy Laverne Bolyn, Thompson Construction Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal of Notices of Appeal) (lgib, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson Construction Group Inc et al v. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Roy Laverne Bolyn
Represented By: Charles Pelot Summerall, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Thompson Construction Group Inc
Represented By: Charles Pelot Summerall, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Thomas Levi Boyd
Represented By: Jason T Moss
Represented By: John B Butler, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Pamela Simmons-Beasley
Represented By: Pamela Simmons-Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bankruptcy Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?