Anderson v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Jesse Edward Anderson
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administrative Record
Case Number: 4:2020cv02984
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jesse Edward Anderson. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration served on 9/8/2020, pursuant to Local Rule 83.VII.03 answer due 1/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of service)(Mayes, W)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 9/18/2020. (gnan )
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION based upon the payment of the (11) filing fee. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 9/18/2020. (gnan )
September 17, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Jesse Edward Anderson.. (Mayes, W)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 400014758. (gnan )
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: In accordance with the policy of the Judicial Conference of the United States, the Administrative Office of the United States Courts (AOUSC) recently completed a Survey of Magistrate Judge Positions in the District of South Carolina. The report is a district-wide review of the court's magistrate judge positions.By local rule, all social security appeals are automatically referred to United States Magistrate Judges on a district-wide rotation for reports and recommendations or final disposition by consent of the parties. According to the report, for the period of 2015-2019, social security appeals in this district increased by 37 percent, and felony criminal cases increased by over 16 percent. Criminal cases take priority over civil cases due in part due to the Speedy Trial Act. Accordingly, consideration of social security appeals is sometimes delayed as a result of the District Court's necessarily dealing with criminal matters which are on a strict statutory deadline.The Federal Magistrates Act of 1968 established the magistrate judge's system as a supplemental judicial resource to assist the district courts and provide better service to litigants. The AOUSC report notes that in 2019, of the 350 social security appeals decided in the District of South Carolina, only 27 (7.7 percent) were disposed of by United States Magistrate Judges with the parties' consent. According to the report:"Many districts around the country have had great success in encouraging consent to magistrate judges in social security appeal cases. Maximizing dispositions on consent rather than through reports and recommendations could be part of the court's strategy, to the extent it is feasible, for maintaining the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of these cases, as well as realizing the benefits of consent outlined below. Consent to disposition by the magistrate judge can bring about a quicker resolution of the appeal than the report and recommendation process.""Therefore, the court may wish to remind the government and members of the social security bar of the consent option, and its time savings for litigants, by appropriate means (e.g., form letters to parties, status conferences, speaking engagements before the bar)." The completion of the AOUSC report is prescient considering recent events which have placed additional strainson district court resources.Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 631, United States Magistrate Judges are appointed by the District Court. Such appointments are made after a rigorous application and screening process. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, a United States Magistrate Judge may, uponconsent of the parties, conduct any or all proceedings in a jury or nonjury civil matter and enter a final order in the case.It has been the practice of this Court to give particular attention to social security appeals given the nature of such actions. However, the impact of increased caseloads, the direct and indirecteffects of the COVID-19 pandemic, and requirement of docket priority for criminal cases will necessarily affect the court's ability to provide for prompt adjudication of social security cases.While parties have the right to adjudication of such matters by a District Judge and may absolutely withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences, based on the foregoing, consideration should be given to the referral of social security appeals to a United States Magistrate Judge for final disposition. The U.S. Attorney for the District of South Carolina has entered a Standing Consent Agreement for such referrals. See 3:04-mc-5005.Accordingly, counsel for the Plaintiff is directed to consult with the Plaintiff concerning the foregoing and to file a status report within 30 days informing the court as to whether Plaintiff consents to disposition by a United States Magistrate Judge. If Plaintiff consents, AO Form 85, found at https://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate -judge may be filed in lieu of the status report. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 9/10/2020. (gnan )
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: On the sole issue of this Report and Recommendation, it is recommended that the Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees be denied. It is recommended upon adoption of this report and recommendation that Plaintiff be ordered to pay the full filing fee within 14 days of the order by the district judge. Objections to R&R due by 9/8/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 8/25/2020. (prou, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (prou, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Jesse Edward Anderson. Response to Motion due by 9/2/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(prou, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website, filed by Jesse Edward Anderson. Service due by 11/17/2020.(prou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Edward Anderson
Represented By: W Daniel Mayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administrative Record
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?