Filyaw v. United Healthcare Insurance Company
Plaintiff: John Filyaw
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv02986
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1381
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Filyaw. Amended United Healthcare Insurance Company served on 9/15/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Green card and DOI Letter)(Louzri, Melissa)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against United Healthcare Insurance Company, filed by John Filyaw. Service due by 12/7/2020 (Louzri, Melissa)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United Healthcare Insurance Company. Service due by 11/17/2020. (lgib, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by John Filyaw. (lgib, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United Healthcare Insurance Company (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9286294), filed by John Filyaw. (lgib, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Filyaw v. United Healthcare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Filyaw
Represented By: Melissa Leila Louzri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?