Negron-Soto v. Knight et al
Petitioner: Moises A. Negron-Soto
Respondent: Melissa Forsyth and Stevie Knight
Case Number: 4:2021cv00456
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Referring Judge: Terry L Wooten
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Moises A. Negron-Soto, #51846-069, FPCE, PO Box 699, Estill, SC, 29918. (prou, )
April 1, 2021 Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is recommended that this case is dismissed without prejudice, that any pending motions be deemed moot, and that the Clerk of Court close the file. Objections to R&R due by 4/15/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 4/1/2021. (prou, )
February 25, 2021 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #6 Proper Form Order w/NEF AO240, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Moises A. Negron-Soto, #51846-069, FPCE, PO Box 699, Estill, SC, 29918 (dsto, )
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 3/18/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 02/25/2021. (dsto, )
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Beaufort. (dsto, )
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 EMERGENCY MOTION pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 2241 and NOTICE FOR IMMEDIATE CONSIDERATION by Moises A. Negron-Soto. Response to Motion due by 2/26/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(dsto, )
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Moises A. Negron-Soto. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Negron-Soto v. Knight et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Melissa Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stevie Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Moises A. Negron-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?