Dozier v. Carlyle Senior Care of Kingstree LLC et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Dozier, Jr
Defendant: Carlyle Senior Care of Kingstree LLC and Candice Slavinski
Case Number: 4:2021cv01303
Filed: May 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 First MOTION to Remand Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Response filed by Christopher Dozier, Jr. (Banyas, Bradley)
June 18, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Bradley Hunter Banyas for June 28-July 12, 2021 (Banyas, Bradley)
June 15, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 First MOTION to Remand Response filed by Carlyle Senior Care of Kingstree LLC.Reply to Response to Motion due by 6/22/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Heslop, Ashley)
June 8, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 First MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Carlyle Senior Care of Kingstree LLC. (Fuerst, Daniel) (Main Document 12 replaced on 6/11/2021 to correct signature as provided by filing user) (lgib, ).
June 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Ashley Sumner Heslop for 6/18-25; 7/19-23 (Heslop, Ashley)
June 1, 2021 Filing 10 First MOTION to Remand by Christopher Dozier, Jr. Response to Motion due by 6/15/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1 Opinion Estate of Maglioli v. Andover Subacute Rehab Ctr. I) No proposed order.(Banyas, Bradley) Modified on 6/2/2021 to correct exhibit description) (lgib, ).
June 1, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 First MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Christopher Dozier, Jr.Reply to Response to Motion due by 6/8/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Banyas, Bradley)
May 24, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response deadline to the Motion to dismiss/transfer venue is extended to 5/31/2021. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 5/24/2021. (lgib, )
May 21, 2021 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 First MOTION to Dismiss by Christopher Dozier, Jr. Response to Motion due by 6/4/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Banyas, Bradley)
May 19, 2021 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Christopher Dozier, Jr.(Banyas, Bradley)
May 10, 2021 Filing 5 First MOTION to Dismiss by Carlyle Senior Care of Kingstree LLC. Response to Motion due by 5/24/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Heslop, Ashley)
May 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Williamsburg County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acknowledgment of Removal)(Heslop, Ashley)
May 3, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Carlyle Senior Care of Kingstree LLC, Candice Slavinski. (lgib, )
May 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Williamsburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-CP-45-00095 (filing fee $402 receipt number 0420-9816020), filed by Carlyle Senior Care of Kingstree LLC, Candice Slavinski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Acceptance of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Offer of Judgment) (lgib, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dozier v. Carlyle Senior Care of Kingstree LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Dozier, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Nathan Hughey
Represented By: Stuart Hudson
Represented By: Bradley Hunter Banyas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlyle Senior Care of Kingstree LLC
Represented By: Ashley Sumner Heslop
Represented By: Jennie Marie Smith
Represented By: Daniel Richard Fuerst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candice Slavinski
Represented By: Ashley Sumner Heslop
Represented By: Jennie Marie Smith
Represented By: Daniel Richard Fuerst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?