Spivack v. NBKC Bank and LoanCare LLC
Plaintiff: April J Spivack
Defendant: NBKC Bank and LoanCare LLC, NBKC Bank and LoanCare LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv02150
Filed: July 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph Dawson
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by April J Spivack as to NBKC Bank, Only (Maxfield, David)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING NBKC Bank without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 8/4/2021. (lgib, )
July 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Enter Rubin Order as to NBKC Bank, Only by April J Spivack (Maxfield, David)
July 19, 2021 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by April J Spivack.(Maxfield, David)
July 16, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by NBKC Bank and LoanCare LLC. (hcic, )
July 16, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by NBKC Bank and LoanCare LLC.(hcic, )
July 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Horry County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-26-03884 (filing fee $402 receipt number 0420-9964303), filed by NBKC Bank and LoanCare LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(hcic, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spivack v. NBKC Bank and LoanCare LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April J Spivack
Represented By: David Andrew Maxfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBKC Bank and LoanCare LLC
Represented By: Chad Wilson Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBKC Bank
Represented By: Chad Wilson Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LoanCare LLC
Represented By: Chad Wilson Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?