Keel v. Waccamaw Mental Health et al
Plaintiff: Molly Keel
Defendant: Waccamaw Mental Health, Kathy Ward, Donno Lupo, MUSC Psychiatric Hospital Charleston SC, EMS Conway Hospital, Horry County Police Dept, Magistrate Judge Harrelson, J Reuben Long Detention Center Conway SC and Judge Livingston
Case Number: 4:2021cv02247
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 Proper Form Order, by Molly Keel. Response to Motion due by 10/1/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
August 17, 2021 Filing 17 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: 16 Text Order on Motion for Extension of Time, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Molly Keel, 259 New River Road, Conway, SC, 29527. (prou, )
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time to comply with the court's proper form order is granted. Plaintiff now has until September 15, 2021 to submit the information required. To the extent Plaintiff seeks to amend her complaint, she is advised that any amended pleading she submits will be subject to further review by the court before a determination is made regarding service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 8/17/2021.(prou, )
August 16, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time re #11 Proper Form Order, MOTION to Amend/Correct re #1 Complaint, ( Response to Motion due by 8/30/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by Molly Keel. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 13 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: 12 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #11 Proper Form Order w/NEF, Summons and (9) USM-285s, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Molly Keel, 259 New River Road, Conway, SC, 29527 (dsto, )
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per #11 Proper Form Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 07/26/2021.(dsto, )
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 8/16/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 07/26/2021. (dsto, )
July 23, 2021 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Molly Keel.(dsto, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Molly Keel. Response to Motion due by 8/5/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EMS Conway Hospital, Magistrate Judge Harrelson, Horry County Police Dept, J Reuben Long Detention Center Conway SC, Judge Livingston, Donno Lupo, MUSC Psychiatric Hospital Charleston SC, Waccamaw Mental Health, Kathy Ward, filed by Molly Keel. Service due by 10/20/2021.(prou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keel v. Waccamaw Mental Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molly Keel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waccamaw Mental Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donno Lupo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUSC Psychiatric Hospital Charleston SC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMS Conway Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horry County Police Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magistrate Judge Harrelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Reuben Long Detention Center Conway SC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?